Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Harris, Alice, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Does 1-25, Captains Table Hotel Llc, represented by William E Bernard, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Shelleyanne W. L. Chang presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeShelleyanne W. L. Chang Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 26, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Cycle Time194 days |
Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 02/03/2009 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2009-02-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2009-01-15T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-11-26T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2009-01-08T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2008-12-09T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-11-26T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2009-01-14T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2008-12-01T00:00:00Notice of Application and Hearing for Right to Attach Order and Writs of Attachment filed.
Date: 2009-01-16T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Admin Event - Legacy heard on 01/27/2009 02:51:25 PM .
Date: 2009-01-27T00:00:00Application for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, Etc. filed.
Date: 2009-01-16T00:00:00Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed.
Date: 2009-01-21T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail generated .
Date: 2009-01-28T00:00:00Application for right to attach order rejected: No application; dropped from calendar
Date: 2009-02-06T00:00:00Correspondence filed.
Date: March 12, 2009Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: April 06, 2009Notice of Appointment of Arbitrator
Date: February 26, 2009Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed.
Date: 2009-02-19T00:00:00Notice of Application and Hearing for Right to Attach Order and Writs of Attachment filed.
Date: 2009-02-13T00:00:00Application for Right to Attach Order, Temporary Protective Order, Etc. filed.
Date: 2009-02-13T00:00:00Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed.
Date: 2009-02-10T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.