Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Masonry Group California Central Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Victor F Luke, against Ase General Contractors Inc, Does 1-25, Islamic Society Of Folsom, Roes 1 To 100, represented by John S Sargetis, Kenneth I Schumaker, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Loren E. McMaster presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLoren E. McMaster Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateNovember 26, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions967 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time1000 days |
Declaration - Other (Scott Zito in support of application for right to attach order) filed.
Date: 2009-05-12T00:00:00Declaration - Other (tom Jones in oppostion to PLF's applic for right to attach order) filed.
Date: 2009-06-03T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Kenneth I Schumaker in opposition to PLF's applic for right to attach order) filed.
Date: 2009-06-03T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Deralyn Dee Porter in support of application for right to attach order) filed.
Date: 2009-05-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2009-06-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2009-09-25T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in opposition to PLF's applic for right to attach order) filed.
Date: 2009-06-03T00:00:00Opposition (to application for right to attach order) filed.
Date: 2009-06-03T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2009-04-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2009-10-05T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 06/10/2009 02:00:00 PM .
Date: 2009-06-10T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion to Strike - Civil Law and Motion heard on 07/20/2009 02:00:00 PM .
Date: 2009-07-20T00:00:00Notice - Other (Of Bond in Support of Writ of Attachment) filed.
Date: 2009-07-08T00:00:00Cross-Complaint filed.
Date: 2009-02-27T00:00:00Application - Other (to Court for Entry of Stipulated Judgment) filed.
Date: July 15, 2011Amended Cross-Complaint filed.
Date: 2009-04-01T00:00:00Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed.
Date: 2010-06-17T00:00:00Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Cause of Actions: filed.
Date: 2010-06-17T00:00:00Mediation Statement filed.
Date: 2009-06-16T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2009-01-15T00:00:00Reply to Opposition (to application for right to attach order) filed.
Date: 2009-06-09T00:00:00Motion to Strike filed.
Date: 2009-06-19T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2009-02-27T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: 2010-06-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2009-10-07T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2009-01-29T00:00:00Order - Other (Stipulated Judgment) filed.
Date: July 21, 2011Notice of Settlement filed.
Date: 2010-05-12T00:00:00Application - Other (Right to attach order and order for right of attachment) filed.
Date: 2009-05-12T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Abdul Esmail in opposition to PLF's applic for right to attach order) filed.
Date: 2009-06-03T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment filed.
Date: July 28, 2011Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in support of application for right to attach order) filed.
Date: 2009-05-12T00:00:00Cross-Complaint filed.
Date: 2009-01-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2009-06-23T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2009-06-16T00:00:00Notice - Other (of Compliance with Court Order: Writ of Attachment) filed.
Date: 2009-07-23T00:00:00Order - Other (Judgment) filed.
Date: July 21, 2011Declaration - Other (Kenneth I Schumaker in support of ASE General Contractor's motion to strike) filed.
Date: 2009-06-19T00:00:00Mediation Statement filed.
Date: 2009-10-05T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: 2010-06-24T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-11-26T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2008-11-26T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2009-01-08T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-11-26T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2009-01-15T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2009-02-10T00:00:00Notice of Application and Hearing for Right to Attach Order and Writs of Attachment filed.
Date: 2009-05-12T00:00:00Court Approval of Letter Request to Continue from 5/13/2009 to 6/10/09 (Never Cal'd for 5/13/09)
Date: 2009-05-13T00:00:00Application for Writ of Attachment Continued
Date: 2009-05-13T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: 2009-05-21T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2009-06-03T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2009-06-16T00:00:00Undertaking Posted filed.
Date: 2009-07-08T00:00:00Minutes finalized for heard on 06/24/2009 01:43:07 PM .
Date: 2009-06-24T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2009-06-19T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: 2009-07-06T00:00:00Right to Attach Order and Order for Issuance of Writ of Attachment After Hearing
Date: 2009-07-29T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (response to request for production of documents set two) filed.
Date: 2010-04-12T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2010-04-12T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2010-04-13T00:00:00Correspondence (Letter Confirming Motion to Compel being taken off calendar) filed.
Date: 2010-05-07T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: August 23, 2011For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.