Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Erica L Brachfeld, against Barksdale, Ollie B., Does 1-100, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Brian R. Van Camp presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrian R. Van Camp Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions494 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time494 days |
Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: February 02, 2010Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-09-30T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2008-09-30T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: September 10, 2009Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-09-30T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: December 09, 2008Default denied as to Barksdale, Ollie B on Complaint .
Date: September 10, 2009Notice - Other (Notice of Name and Address Change of Plaintiffs Counsel) filed.
Date: February 03, 2010For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.