Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Elk Grove Unified School District, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Daniel M Maruccia, against Vail, Melvin C., Trainor, Robertson, Smits & Wade Comerica Bank, Jacobs, Kate G., First American Title Company, Douglas Road 103 Investors, (total of 9) See All in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions132 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
|
Case Cycle Time132 days |
Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Serve Pleading and Orders filed.
Date: December 01, 2008Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-09-30T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: December 10, 2008Request for Dismissal filed.
Date: December 02, 2008Amended Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-10-14T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2008-09-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-09-30T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2008-10-14T00:00:00Paper Exhibits filed.
Date: 2008-10-16T00:00:00Disclaimer of Interest filed.
Date: 2008-11-18T00:00:00Notice of Related Case filed.
Date: December 12, 2008For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.