Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Wells Fargo Bank National Association, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by John H Wunsch, against The Hamner Family Limited Partnership, Hamner, Sonnie Laine, Hamner, Gary Allen, Does 1 To 20, represented by Tina Hopper, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Raymond M. Cadei presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRaymond M. Cadei Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 31, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMay 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions326 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time3326 days |
Declaration - Other (in support of Opposition to MSJ) filed.
Date: 2009-05-22T00:00:00Judgment by Court Under CCP 437c
Date: 2009-06-22T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2009-05-22T00:00:00Reply - Other (in support of MSJ) filed.
Date: 2009-05-29T00:00:00Declaration - Other (John H Wunsch in support of MSJ/MSA) filed.
Date: 2009-03-30T00:00:00Statement - Other (separtate statement in Opposition to Plaintiff'sMSJ) filed.
Date: 2009-05-22T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (in support) filed.
Date: August 26, 2009Notice - Other (of Non-Opposition) filed.
Date: September 11, 2009Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-07-31T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication filed.
Date: 2009-03-30T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Nogales- Till in support) filed.
Date: 2009-08-26T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Oscar Urizar in support of MSJ/MSA) filed.
Date: 2009-03-30T00:00:00Statement of Undisputed Facts (in support of MSJ/MSA) filed.
Date: 2009-03-30T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2008-10-31T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment filed.
Date: 2009-07-08T00:00:00Reply - Other (in support of mtn) filed.
Date: September 17, 2009Mediation Statement filed.
Date: 2009-01-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2009-01-14T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of T. Hopper in support of Opposition to MSJ) filed.
Date: 2009-05-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2009-01-13T00:00:00Amended Judgment Nunc Pro Tunc
Date: September 24, 2009Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in support of MSJ/MSA) filed.
Date: 2009-03-30T00:00:00Order Granting Wells Fargo Bank, National Association's Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2009-06-22T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order (Amended--nunc pro tunc) filed.
Date: October 15, 2009Memorandum of Costs (Summary) filed.
Date: 2009-07-14T00:00:00Clerk's Comment-Proof of Service-Return Document
Date: 2008-10-20T00:00:00Declaration of Non Service filed.
Date: 2008-10-08T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2008-10-08T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-07-31T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2008-07-31T00:00:00Certificate of Service filed.
Date: 2008-10-08T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2008-11-10T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2009-03-30T00:00:00Correspondence filed.
Date: 2009-06-22T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: 2009-07-20T00:00:00Motion for Attorney Fees filed.
Date: 2009-08-26T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2009-08-26T00:00:00Notice - Other (Specific Release of Lien) filed.
Date: September 08, 2017For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.