Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Hsbc Bank Nevada Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Janet L Brown, against Urbano, Manuel M., Does 1-10, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 31, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions131 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time231 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-07-31T00:00:00Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
Date: March 19, 2009Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2008-09-03T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: December 09, 2008Declaration - Other (of Compliance With CCP Section 1033) filed.
Date: 2008-12-09T00:00:00Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2008-12-09T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2008-07-31T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does - Default Judgment Pending filed.
Date: 2008-12-09T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name filed.
Date: 2008-12-09T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-07-31T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: February 05, 2009Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: March 13, 2009Writ of Execution (Yolo) Issued
Date: February 17, 2009Notice of Change of Firm Name filed.
Date: March 19, 2009Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: March 19, 2009For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.