Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Janet L Brown, against Petershagen, Jodie H., Does 1 - 10, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Roland L. Candee presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRoland L. Candee Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 31, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions221 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time249 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-07-31T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2008-07-31T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: March 09, 2009Declaration of Non Service filed.
Date: 2008-08-27T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2008-08-29T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name filed.
Date: March 09, 2009Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-07-31T00:00:00Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: March 09, 2009Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: April 06, 2009Request for Dismissal of Does - Default Judgment Pending filed.
Date: March 09, 2009Declaration - Other (Waiver of Excess Attorneys' Fees) filed.
Date: March 09, 2009For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.