Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Black, Jason C., Black, Stephanie, Braga, Brenda, Braga, Bruce, Chacon, Jennifer, (total of 20) See All filed a(n) Construction - Torts case represented by Mark Arruti, Matthew R Schoech, against Adland Venture Lp, A Teichert & Son, Inc, Bardis, Rachel Katherine, B&B Contruction, Blazona Concrete Construction, Inc, (total of 40) See All represented by Ayhan M Menekshe, Brian C Haydon, Carl P Blaine, Deborah A Correll, Gino Cano, (total of 11) See All in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David I. Brown presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid I. Brown Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 31, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions452 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeConstruction |
|
Case Cycle Time3332 days |
Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2008-12-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-09-09T00:00:00Order Granting Defendant/Cross-Complainant's Motion for Good Faith Settlement
Date: 2011-12-02T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2010-01-21T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2010-11-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-06-29T00:00:00Mediation Statement filed.
Date: 2010-12-06T00:00:00Notice - Other (of Settlement) filed.
Date: 2011-11-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-07-13T00:00:00Correspondence (Letter from Special Master Peter Dekker dated October 25, 2011) filed.
Date: 2011-10-28T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2011-11-08T00:00:00Statement - Other (separate) filed.
Date: 2012-03-12T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2011-11-30T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2011-05-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2010-05-25T00:00:00Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement filed.
Date: 2011-11-21T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed.
Date: 2012-03-15T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2012-05-11T00:00:00Stipulation and Order filed.
Date: 2011-09-08T00:00:00Notice of Entry - Other (Notice of Entry of Order) filed.
Date: 2011-12-13T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Determination of Good Faith Settlement heard on 12/02/2011 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2011-12-02T00:00:00Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed.
Date: 2011-08-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-06-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-09-15T00:00:00Statement of Undisputed Facts filed.
Date: 2012-05-11T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Matthew R Schoech in Support of Motion for Good Faith Settlement) filed.
Date: 2012-04-13T00:00:00Order Granting Determination of Good Faith Settlement Motion of Troy Scott's Custom Grading, Inc.
Date: 2012-06-08T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Brian Haydon in Support of Motion for Good Faith Settlement) filed.
Date: 2012-04-13T00:00:00Order Granting Good Faith Settlement of Genesis Tile Corporation dba Tileco
Date: 2012-01-27T00:00:00Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement filed.
Date: 2012-05-11T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: 2012-04-27T00:00:00Ex Parte Application - Other (for a court ordered MSC) filed.
Date: 2012-06-07T00:00:00Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed.
Date: 2011-06-02T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication filed.
Date: 2012-03-12T00:00:00Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time filed.
Date: 2012-02-08T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: 2012-06-01T00:00:00Correspondence (Letter from Attorney John D. Broghammer dated February 29, 2012) filed.
Date: 2012-02-29T00:00:00Answer (to First Amended Complaint) filed.
Date: 2011-09-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2010-11-24T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2011-07-14T00:00:00Notice - Other (Amended Notice of Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement) filed.
Date: 2012-04-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-07-01T00:00:00Minute Order
Date: 2011-05-02T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: 2011-08-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-07-06T00:00:00Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement filed.
Date: 2011-12-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-09-08T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2009-12-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-03-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-07-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2010-05-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2010-01-22T00:00:00Amended Complaint filed.
Date: 2009-06-12T00:00:00Complaint - Doe Amendment filed.
Date: 2009-10-13T00:00:00Mediation Statement filed.
Date: 2010-01-21T00:00:00Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement filed.
Date: 2012-03-22T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2011-06-06T00:00:00Statement - Other (in Lieu of Reply...) filed.
Date: 2012-04-12T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2012-03-12T00:00:00Complaint - Doe Amendment filed.
Date: 2011-04-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-09-12T00:00:00Objection (To Evidence Submitted By Defendant Wallace-Kuhl & Associates) filed.
Date: 2012-05-11T00:00:00Reply to Opposition (To Defendant Wallace-Kuhl & Associates, Inc. Motion For Summary Judgment) filed.
Date: 2012-05-18T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2011-11-21T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Determination of Good Faith Settlement heard on 04/20/2012 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2012-04-20T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2010-12-14T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2009-12-08T00:00:00Notice - Other (Settlement) filed.
Date: 2011-12-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2010-01-26T00:00:00Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time filed.
Date: 2011-11-18T00:00:00Declaration - Other (in Support of Motion) filed.
Date: 2011-11-21T00:00:00Stipulation For Settlement; Order
Date: 2012-06-14T00:00:00Cross-Complaint filed.
Date: 2009-12-30T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2012-06-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2010-11-18T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Date: 2011-12-20T00:00:00Mediation Statement filed.
Date: 2011-07-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2010-05-27T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-07-31T00:00:00Notice of Motion (2nd amended) filed.
Date: 2012-05-25T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2011-12-21T00:00:00Mediation Statement filed.
Date: 2011-07-13T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2009-12-28T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2009-12-03T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion for Good Faith Settlement) filed.
Date: 2012-01-05T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: 2010-11-17T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed.
Date: 2012-05-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-06-30T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2011-06-20T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: 2012-03-15T00:00:00Mediation Statement filed.
Date: 2010-11-24T00:00:00Order - Other (Judicial Disclosure) filed.
Date: 2011-11-08T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed.
Date: 2012-03-29T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2011-07-13T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: September 24, 2012Answer submitted by Buetler Corporation rejected on 11/04/2009 .
Date: 2009-11-30T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed.
Date: July 27, 2012Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed.
Date: 2011-06-10T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: 2012-03-29T00:00:00Reply to Opposition of Noticed Motion filed.
Date: 2012-02-08T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed.
Date: 2012-07-18T00:00:00Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement filed.
Date: 2011-12-21T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication filed.
Date: 2012-03-12T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed.
Date: 2012-02-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-09-19T00:00:00Opposition (to Motion fot Determination of Good Faith Settlement) filed.
Date: 2012-02-03T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: 2011-06-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-03-28T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Determination of Good Faith Settlement heard on 06/08/2012 08:30:00 AM .
Date: 2012-06-08T00:00:00Notice of Settlement filed.
Date: 2012-06-14T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Determination of Good Faith Settlement heard on 02/17/2012 08:30:00 AM .
Date: 2012-02-17T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Special Sets heard on 01/09/2009 09:30:00 AM .
Date: 2009-01-16T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: 2011-07-07T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Special Sets heard on 10/10/2008 09:30:00 AM .
Date: 2008-10-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-03-30T00:00:00Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement filed.
Date: 2011-12-20T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint filed.
Date: 2010-09-16T00:00:00Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement filed.
Date: 2012-04-13T00:00:00Correspondence (Letter from Special Master Peter Dekker dated November 10, 2010) filed.
Date: 2010-11-15T00:00:00Notice of Entry - Other (of Order) filed.
Date: 2012-02-10T00:00:00Order Granting Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement of Defendant Ad Land Venture (Doe 69)
Date: 2012-03-01T00:00:00Correspondence (Confirm Motion for Summary Adjudication/Summary Judgment, 5/25/12, Droped) filed.
Date: 2012-05-22T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of James W Doran in support of Application for Good Faith Settlement) filed.
Date: 2011-12-30T00:00:00Request - Judicial Notice filed.
Date: 2012-03-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2009-04-08T00:00:00NOTICE TRANSFER AND REASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL COMPLEX CASES TO DEPT. 13
Date: 2009-12-30T00:00:00Mediation Statement filed.
Date: 2011-03-29T00:00:00Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement filed.
Date: 2011-11-14T00:00:00Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed.
Date: September 24, 2012Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2008-10-01T00:00:00Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed.
Date: 2010-11-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-08-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-07-05T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.
Date: 2011-06-30T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support of Motion for Good Faith Settlement) filed.
Date: 2012-04-13T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2009-07-06T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: 2009-12-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-09-16T00:00:00Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time filed.
Date: 2012-02-07T00:00:00Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed.
Date: 2009-10-13T00:00:00Mediation Statement filed.
Date: 2011-07-08T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2011-03-17T00:00:00Notice - Other (of Entry of Order) filed.
Date: 2011-12-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2010-05-07T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-07-31T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2008-07-31T00:00:00Minutes finalized for heard on 08/19/2008 10:17:57 AM .
Date: 2008-08-19T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2008-10-03T00:00:00Certificate of Service filed.
Date: 2008-10-03T00:00:00Minutes finalized for heard on 12/04/2008 08:31:09 AM .
Date: 2008-12-04T00:00:00Minutes finalized for heard on 12/22/2008 11:34:04 AM .
Date: 2008-12-22T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2009-03-13T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2009-02-09T00:00:00Minutes finalized for heard on 03/05/2009 03:52:50 PM .
Date: 2009-03-05T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference - Civil Special Sets heard on 04/17/2009 01:30:00 PM .
Date: 2009-04-17T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2009-06-12T00:00:00Proof of Service Misc - Non Complaint/Petition filed.
Date: 2009-07-30T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference - Civil Special Sets heard on 08/07/2009 11:00:00 AM .
Date: 2009-08-11T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default submitted by Galli, Corinna rejected on 10/20/2009 .
Date: 2009-10-22T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default filed.
Date: 2009-10-23T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default submitted by Galli, Corinna rejected on 10/23/2009 .
Date: 2009-10-27T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2009-10-28T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2009-10-29T00:00:00First Paper - Other filed.
Date: 2009-11-05T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default filed.
Date: 2009-11-19T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2009-12-30T00:00:00Notice - Other (Of Unavailability of Counsel) filed.
Date: 2010-03-26T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference - Civil Special Sets heard on 02/05/2010 01:30:00 PM .
Date: 2010-02-05T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2010-04-12T00:00:00Pre Trial Order No. 1 Re: Pleadings, Discovery, Pre-trial Settlement Matters
Date: 2010-08-05T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference - Civil Special Sets heard on 06/11/2010 10:00:00 AM .
Date: 2010-06-11T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default submitted by Galli, Corinna rejected on 09/27/2010 .
Date: 2010-09-27T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default filed.
Date: 2010-10-01T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address and Telephone filed.
Date: 2010-10-19T00:00:00Proof of Service - PERSONAL submitted by Galli, Corinna rejected on 10/14/2010 .
Date: 2010-10-14T00:00:00Notice - Other (of Case Management Conference) filed.
Date: 2010-09-27T00:00:00Order Rescheduling Case Management Conference
Date: 2010-11-30T00:00:00Order Continuing Case Management Conference
Date: 2010-11-30T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name filed.
Date: 2011-01-20T00:00:00Notice of Change in Handling Attorney filed.
Date: 2011-01-20T00:00:00Order Rescheduling Case Management Conference
Date: 2011-01-27T00:00:00Correspondence filed.
Date: 2011-03-17T00:00:00Order Continuing Case Management Conference
Date: 2011-03-24T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default filed.
Date: 2011-04-13T00:00:00Proof of Service submitted by Galli, Corinna rejected on 05/17/2011 .
Date: 2011-05-17T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2011-05-09T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2011-05-09T00:00:00Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed.
Date: 2011-05-18T00:00:00Proof of Service (By Substituted service) filed.
Date: 2011-06-21T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.
Date: 2011-06-22T00:00:00Tentative Ruling on Complex Fees
Date: 2011-07-21T00:00:00Order After Case Management Conference
Date: 2011-08-03T00:00:00Complex Fees
Date: 2011-08-03T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.
Date: 2011-07-26T00:00:00Request - Entry of Default filed.
Date: 2011-08-10T00:00:00Complex Fees (AMENDED)
Date: 2011-08-11T00:00:00Notice - Other (of Payment of Complex Fees- Payment 1 of 6) filed.
Date: 2011-08-10T00:00:00Notice - Other (of Payment of Complex Fees-Payment 2 of 6) filed.
Date: 2011-09-13T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to Set Aside Default of Tidwell Enterprises, Inc. (Granted)
Date: 2011-09-30T00:00:00Notice of Trial filed.
Date: 2011-10-03T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Status Conference - Civil Special Sets heard on 09/30/2011 09:00:00 AM .
Date: 2011-09-30T00:00:00Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other (to Set Aside Default) filed.
Date: 2011-10-31T00:00:00Order After Case Management Conference
Date: 2011-10-03T00:00:00Order - Other (Discovery Order No. 1) filed.
Date: 2011-11-04T00:00:00Proof of Service by Facsimile (Discovery Order No. 1)
Date: 2011-10-28T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2011-11-14T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2011-11-21T00:00:00Notice of Entry - Other (of Order to Set Aside Default Entered Against def) filed.
Date: 2011-11-30T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2011-12-20T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2011-12-21T00:00:00Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other (to set aside default) filed.
Date: 2011-12-23T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to Set Aside Default
Date: 2012-01-03T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name filed.
Date: 2011-12-29T00:00:00Notice - Other (of Lodging certified return receipts re:app for GFS) filed.
Date: 2012-01-17T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Dec of Matthew R Schoech) filed.
Date: 2012-02-09T00:00:00Notice of Entry - Other filed.
Date: 2012-03-08T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of D Maastricht) filed.
Date: 2012-03-12T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of D Swartz) filed.
Date: 2012-03-12T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of B C Haydon) filed.
Date: 2012-03-12T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of J M Chopurian) filed.
Date: 2012-03-12T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2012-03-22T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2011-05-13T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2011-05-13T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2011-05-20T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2011-05-27T00:00:00Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed.
Date: 2011-05-24T00:00:00Statement - Other (Certificate of Merit) filed.
Date: 2011-06-09T00:00:00Order Determining that Liberty Bell Alarm Company, Inc.'s Settlement was reached in Good Faith
Date: 2012-04-23T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Of Shane Chacon) filed.
Date: 2012-05-11T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Of Thomas M. Santos) filed.
Date: 2012-05-11T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Of Douglas C. Ross) filed.
Date: 2012-05-11T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Errata To Declaration Of Julie M. Chopourian) filed.
Date: 2012-05-18T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Of Brian McDougle) filed.
Date: 2012-05-11T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Of Scott A. Thoeny) filed.
Date: 2012-05-11T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Of Robert D. Finkle) filed.
Date: 2012-05-11T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Of Robert J. Kitz) filed.
Date: 2012-05-11T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Of John D. Broghammer) filed.
Date: 2012-05-18T00:00:00Order Granting Plaintiffs' Application Requesting Court Ordered Mandatory Settlement Conference
Date: 2012-06-08T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .
Date: 2012-06-18T00:00:00Jury Fee Request For Refund - Approved filed.
Date: 2012-07-19T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: October 10, 2012Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.
Date: December 05, 2012For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.