Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lobel Financial Corp, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Ronald J Green, Jr, against Does 1-10, Ayers, Gerald, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David W. Abbott presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid W. Abbott Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions221 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time749 days |
Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: July 15, 2010Statement - Other (of Location) filed.
Date: 2008-06-30T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-06-30T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: October 06, 2008Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-06-30T00:00:00Affidavit - Other (of Due Diligence) filed.
Date: 2008-10-06T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2008-06-30T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment filed.
Date: April 16, 2010Declaration in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) filed.
Date: April 16, 2010Returned Documents(Court Judgment)Rejected
Date: June 07, 2010Request for Entry of Default filed.
Date: 2008-10-06T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: April 16, 2010For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.