Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Sutter Tracy Community Hospital, Sutter Medical Center Of Santa Rosa, Sutter Maternity And Surgery Center Of Santa Cruz, Sutter Lakeside Hospital, Sutter Health Sacramento Sierra Region, (total of 13) See All filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Stephen L. Goff, against Kaiser Permanente Insurance Company, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc, Does 1 - 50, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Cycle Time179 days |
Motion for Change of Venue filed.
Date: 2008-10-22T00:00:00Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time to Serve Pleading and Orders filed.
Date: 2008-08-13T00:00:00Tentative Ruling for Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion set on 11/14/2008 09:30:00 AM published .
Date: 2008-11-12T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Declaration of Brian Taylor in Opposition To Def Motion For Change of Venue) filed.
Date: 2008-10-31T00:00:00Memorandum of Points and Authorities (In Support Of Motion For Change Of Venue) filed.
Date: 2008-10-22T00:00:00Ex Parte Application to Extension of Time to Serve Pleading and Orders - Granted
Date: 2008-08-20T00:00:00Opposition to Noticed Motion (Plaintiffs Opposition To Def Motion For Change of Venue) filed.
Date: 2008-10-31T00:00:00Confirmation letter sent to Alameda County 12/15/08
Date: December 15, 2008Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion heard on 11/14/2008 09:30:00 AM .
Date: November 14, 2008Notice - Other (Defendants Second Amended Notice Of Motion For Change Of Venue) filed.
Date: 2008-11-06T00:00:00Amended Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-07-01T00:00:00Paper Exhibits (Defendants Supplemental Evidence In Support Of Motion For Change Of Venue) filed.
Date: 2008-11-06T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-06-30T00:00:00Reply - Other (Defendants Reply) filed.
Date: 2008-11-06T00:00:00Paper Exhibits (Evidence In Support Of Motion For Change Of Venue) filed.
Date: 2008-10-22T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2008-07-01T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2008-07-08T00:00:00Certificate of Service filed.
Date: 2008-07-25T00:00:00Returned Document Form (Notice of Motion)
Date: 2008-10-20T00:00:00Receipt for documents and pleadings received 12/19/08 from Alameda County
Date: December 22, 2008Returned Document Form (Abstract of Judgment)
Date: December 26, 2008Certified Return Receipt Received 12/11/08 from Alameda County
Date: December 19, 2008ORDER AFTER HEARING-11/14/08
Date: December 08, 2008Notice of Transmittal of papers and pleadings
Date: December 11, 2008Summons filed.
Date: 2008-06-30T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.