Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ataya, Hani, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by David G Crowdis, against Does 1-25, Cooper, Chad Anthony, Central Valley Engineering And Asphalt Inc, represented by Stephanie L Quinn, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Shelleyanne W. L. Chang presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeShelleyanne W. L. Chang Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions437 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time508 days |
Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2009-01-09T00:00:00Motion for Sanctions filed.
Date: 2009-06-19T00:00:00Statement - Other (in support of motion to compel responses to request for production) filed.
Date: 2009-03-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2008-12-22T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Arbitrator Selection Call-in heard on 02/04/2009 08:51:17 AM .
Date: 2009-02-04T00:00:00Agreement to Serve as Arbitrator filed.
Date: 2009-03-20T00:00:00Response (To Notice of MotionAnd Motion For Monetary Issue and Evidence Sanctions) filed.
Date: 2009-06-25T00:00:00Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: November 20, 2009Reply - Other (to non-opposition to motion to compel) filed.
Date: 2009-04-13T00:00:00Ex Parte Application to Extend Arbitration Date - (granted)
Date: 2009-06-10T00:00:00JUDGMENT IN ARBITRATION PROCEEDINGS
Date: November 20, 2009Order and Judgment on Motion for Sanctions
Date: September 10, 2009Ex Parte Application to Extend Arbitration Date filed.
Date: 2009-06-04T00:00:00Answer filed.
Date: 2008-08-04T00:00:00Award of Arbitrator filed.
Date: September 17, 2009Notice of Entry of Judgment filed.
Date: September 29, 2009Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in support of motion to compel discovery) filed.
Date: 2008-11-19T00:00:00Reply - Other (To Non-Opposition To Motion To Compel Discovery Responses And Req For Sanctions) filed.
Date: 2008-12-10T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Stephanie L Quinn in support of motion to compel discovery) filed.
Date: 2008-11-19T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (Discovery responses) filed.
Date: 2008-11-19T00:00:00Notice of Appointment of Arbitrator
Date: 2009-02-26T00:00:00Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail generated .
Date: 2009-02-05T00:00:00Notice of Arbitration Hearing filed.
Date: 2009-03-20T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Stephanie L Quinn in support of motion to compel amended discover responses) filed.
Date: 2009-03-19T00:00:00Correspondence filed.
Date: 2009-05-21T00:00:00Proof of Service filed.
Date: 2009-04-28T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.