Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Beneficial California Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Ann K Merrill, against Does 1 - 10, Mendoza, Donna, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 30, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions204 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time204 days |
Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed.
Date: January 15, 2009Complaint filed.
Date: June 30, 2008Summons filed.
Date: 2008-06-30T00:00:00Declaration of Non Service filed.
Date: December 01, 2008Declaration of Non Service filed.
Date: August 13, 2008Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-06-30T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: December 12, 2008Notice of Change of Firm Name filed.
Date: January 15, 2009For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.