Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Mark D Walsh, against Thorns, Angelica E., Does 1 - 10, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David W. Abbott presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid W. Abbott Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions121 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time423 days |
Complaint filed.
Date: 2008-06-30T00:00:00Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
Date: August 27, 2009Request for Dismissal of Does - Default Judgment Pending filed.
Date: October 29, 2008Application - Other (For Interest Costs & Atty Fees) filed.
Date: October 29, 2008Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: October 29, 2008Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-06-30T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2008-07-25T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2008-06-30T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2008-06-30T00:00:00Writ of Execution (Sacramento) Issued
Date: February 03, 2009Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: June 25, 2009Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2008-10-29T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address filed.
Date: 2008-10-29T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: February 03, 2009For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.