Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Asset Acceptance Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Carolyn M Kennedy, against Selby, April, Does 1-10, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Judy Holzer Hersher presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudy Holzer Hersher Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 30, 2008 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions49 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time690 days |
Complaint - (B&P 6322) filed.
Date: 2008-06-30T00:00:00Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
Date: May 21, 2010Statement of Venue filed.
Date: 2008-06-30T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: 2008-08-18T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2008-06-30T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2008-07-08T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2008-06-30T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2008-06-30T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2008-08-18T00:00:00Writ of Execution (Issued) Issued
Date: February 19, 2009Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2008-08-18T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: January 13, 2009Notice of Change of Address filed.
Date: February 19, 2009Writ of Execution Returned - Wholly Satisfied filed.
Date: May 04, 2010For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.