Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Chase Bank Usa, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by David B Snyder, Michael S Hunt, Shedrick O Davis, Iii, against Does 1-10, Hill, Tona R., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Shelleyanne W. L. Chang presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeShelleyanne W. L. Chang Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2007 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions267 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time3244 days |
Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
Date: November 17, 2016Complaint filed.
Date: 2007-12-31T00:00:00Does 1-10 Dismissed
Date: January 21, 2009Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2007-12-31T00:00:00Declaration - Other (re lost original) filed.
Date: December 02, 2008Summons filed.
Date: 2007-12-31T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2008-01-28T00:00:00Declaration - Other (ccp 1033) filed.
Date: 2008-12-02T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) filed.
Date: 2008-12-02T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment filed.
Date: 2008-04-17T00:00:00Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: January 08, 2010Writ of Execution Issued
Date: March 09, 2009Judgment by Default by Court Granted
Date: January 21, 2009Association of Attorney filed.
Date: November 17, 2016For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.