Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cach Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Gloria Zarco, against Does 1-10, Moua, Cha, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David W. Abbott presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid W. Abbott Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2007 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions140 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time4238 days |
Mediation Statement filed.
Date: 2008-01-28T00:00:00Application for Renewal of Judgment filed.
Date: May 06, 2019Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Date: 2012-01-26T00:00:00Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: 2009-09-16T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2007-12-31T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment filed.
Date: 2012-01-26T00:00:00Notice of Renewal of Judgment filed.
Date: May 06, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2007-12-31T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2007-12-31T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2008-03-13T00:00:00Declaration - Other (of Interest Calculation) filed.
Date: 2009-01-09T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default filed.
Date: 2008-03-13T00:00:00Declaration - Other (in Support of Request for Attorney Fees) filed.
Date: 2009-01-09T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address filed.
Date: 2009-01-09T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Pursuant to CCP 1033) filed.
Date: 2009-01-09T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment filed.
Date: 2009-01-09T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.
Date: 2012-01-26T00:00:00Judgment by Court by Default
Date: 2009-09-16T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: 2012-01-03T00:00:00Writ of Execution Issued
Date: 2012-01-26T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: 2012-01-26T00:00:00Writ of Execution (Sacramento) Issued
Date: November 18, 2013Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: May 22, 2013Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed.
Date: May 09, 2017Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.
Date: May 06, 2019Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: August 08, 2019Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: May 31, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.