Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
The Golden 1 Credit Union, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Barry A Smith, against Mcdonald, Jabin, Does 1-10, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with David I. Brown presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid I. Brown Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2007 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions267 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1694 days |
Does 1-10 Dismissed
Date: 2009-01-30T00:00:00Declaration - Other (in support of allowing copy of document to be filed in lieu of original) filed.
Date: 2008-12-26T00:00:00Notice of Opposition to Claim of Exemption filed.
Date: June 23, 2011Complaint filed.
Date: 2007-12-31T00:00:00Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.
Date: August 20, 2012Notice of Entry of Judgment filed.
Date: 2009-02-17T00:00:00Satisfaction of Judgment - partial filed.
Date: May 23, 2012Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2007-12-31T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2007-12-31T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment filed.
Date: 2008-05-02T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2008-05-23T00:00:00Declaration - Other (in support of attorney fees) filed.
Date: 2008-12-26T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Default Judgment by Court CCP 585(d) filed.
Date: 2008-12-26T00:00:00Judgment by Default by Court Granted
Date: 2009-01-30T00:00:00Writ of Execution Issued
Date: January 24, 2011Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: 2009-02-17T00:00:00Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption filed.
Date: June 23, 2011Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2009-02-02T00:00:00Order After Hearing (Order re: Claim of Exemption) filed.
Date: July 18, 2011For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.