Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Professional Collection Consultants, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Clark Garen, against Fierro, Jimmy J., Does 1-10, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Christopher E. Krueger presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChristopher E. Krueger Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2007 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions290 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time3952 days |
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Date: 2012-10-18T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Date: 2014-11-10T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Date: 2011-09-08T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Date: 2013-04-15T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Date: 2015-10-16T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Date: 2009-10-28T00:00:00Application for Renewal of Judgment filed.
Date: 2017-03-20T00:00:00Request - Other (that Copies be Admitted into Evidence) filed.
Date: 2008-06-09T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2007-12-31T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed.
Date: 2010-10-22T00:00:00Assignment of Judgment filed.
Date: December 14, 2017Assignment of Judgment filed.
Date: April 30, 2018Does 1-10 Dismissed
Date: 2009-03-20T00:00:00Notice of Renewal of Judgment filed.
Date: 2017-03-20T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2007-12-31T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2007-12-31T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2007-12-31T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.
Date: 2008-05-13T00:00:00Declaration - Other (RE Open Book Account) filed.
Date: 2008-06-09T00:00:00Declaration - Other (RE Accrued Interest) filed.
Date: 2008-06-09T00:00:00Declaration - Other (RE Attorney Fees) filed.
Date: 2008-06-09T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure 585 Evidence Code 1531 1550 1551) filed.
Date: 2008-06-09T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment filed.
Date: 2008-06-09T00:00:00Declaration - Other (Pursuant to CCP 585) filed.
Date: 2008-06-09T00:00:00Judgment by Default by Court Granted
Date: 2009-03-20T00:00:00Writ of Execution (Sacramento) Issued
Date: 2009-04-23T00:00:00Writ of Execution (Sacramento) Issued
Date: 2010-01-06T00:00:00Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied (Sacramento) filed.
Date: 2011-01-07T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney filed.
Date: 2011-08-11T00:00:00Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed.
Date: 2010-08-11T00:00:00Writ of Execution Issued
Date: 2010-10-22T00:00:00Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed.
Date: 2012-05-01T00:00:00Writ of Execution submitted by Professional Collection Consultants rejected on 09/07/2012 .
Date: 2012-09-07T00:00:00Writ of Execution Issued
Date: 2011-09-08T00:00:00Writ of Execution (sacramento) Issued
Date: 2012-10-18T00:00:00Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: 2014-05-06T00:00:00Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: 2013-12-04T00:00:00Writ of Execution Issued
Date: 2013-04-15T00:00:00Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES) Issued
Date: 2014-11-10T00:00:00Writ of Execution Returned - Partially Satisfied filed.
Date: 2015-09-17T00:00:00Writ of Execution (LOS ANGELES) Issued
Date: 2015-11-09T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: April 10, 2017Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: April 24, 2017Writ of Execution (Los Angeles) Issued
Date: May 16, 2017Writ of Execution (Los Angeles) Issued
Date: October 26, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.