Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Citibank South Dakota N A, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Janalie Henriques, against Ayers, Kimberly Hall, Does 1-5, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Shelleyanne W. L. Chang presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeShelleyanne W. L. Chang Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2007 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions84 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time3810 days |
Notice of Renewal of Judgment filed.
Date: March 14, 2018Complaint filed.
Date: 2007-12-31T00:00:00Application for Renewal of Judgment filed.
Date: March 14, 2018Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: March 24, 2008Summons filed.
Date: 2007-12-31T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2007-12-31T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2008-02-22T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2008-03-24T00:00:00Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2008-03-24T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: November 26, 2008Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: June 06, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.