Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Keypoint Credit Union, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Thomas Caudill, against Does 1-30, Keh, William S., in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Richard K. Sueyoshi presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard K. Sueyoshi Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2007 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions235 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time1205 days |
Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2008-09-26T00:00:00Order to Appear for Examination
Date: 2008-12-30T00:00:00Order for Supplemental Case Management Statement on Limited Civil Case
Date: 2008-07-17T00:00:00Application and Order for Appearance and Examination of Judgment Debtor filed.
Date: 2008-12-22T00:00:00Does 1-30 Dismissed
Date: 2008-12-12T00:00:00Complaint filed.
Date: 2007-12-31T00:00:00Application and Order for Appearance and Examination - Issued
Date: 2009-09-14T00:00:00Order to Appear for Examination
Date: March 04, 2011Case Management Statement filed.
Date: 2008-05-16T00:00:00Application and Order for Appearance and Examination of Judgment Debtor filed.
Date: February 18, 2011Application and Order for Appearance and Examination - Issued
Date: 2009-05-22T00:00:00Order for Supplemental Case Management Statement on Limited Civil Case
Date: 2008-10-01T00:00:00Application and Order for Appearance and Examination of Judgment Debtor filed.
Date: 2009-05-20T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default and Court Judgment filed.
Date: 2008-02-27T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2007-12-31T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2007-12-31T00:00:00Proof of Service - MAILING filed.
Date: 2008-01-22T00:00:00Judgment by Default by Court Granted
Date: 2008-12-12T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Order of Examination - OX Calendar heard on 02/09/2009 08:15:00 AM .
Date: 2009-02-09T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: October 28, 2009Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: 2009-01-20T00:00:00Minutes finalized for Order of Examination - OX Calendar heard on 10/28/2009 08:30:00 AM .
Date: October 28, 2009Letter Vacating OX Hearing
Date: 2009-06-04T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.