Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Mark D Walsh, against Does 1-10, Adams, Mary, in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts with Raoul M. Thorbourne presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRaoul M. Thorbourne Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2007 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions259 days |
Filing LocationSacramento County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1400 days |
Application - Other (App re: CCP 1033) filed.
Date: October 27, 2008Request for Dismissal of Does filed.
Date: October 27, 2008Complaint filed.
Date: 2007-12-31T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.
Date: 2007-12-31T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address filed.
Date: October 27, 2008Notice of Change of Address filed.
Date: December 19, 2008Request for Clerk's Judgment filed.
Date: 2008-10-27T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default filed.
Date: 2008-04-04T00:00:00Declaration - Other filed.
Date: 2007-12-31T00:00:00Judgment - by Clerk - Default filed.
Date: 2008-10-27T00:00:00Summons filed.
Date: 2007-12-31T00:00:00Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.
Date: 2008-02-14T00:00:00Abstract of Judgment Issued
Date: January 23, 2009Writ of Execution (Sacramento) Issued
Date: January 23, 2009Writ of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed.
Date: October 31, 2011For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.