Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mcmahan, Michael Ryan, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Distaso, Joseph Richard presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDistaso, Joseph Richard Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2004 |
CategoryGuardianship: Person/Relative |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 24, 2009 | Docket Event | Subsequent Petition Hearing | |
August 11, 2009 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver Granted | |
February 27, 2004 | Docket Event | Petition Hearing | |
February 18, 2004 | Docket Event | Petition Hearing | |
January 08, 2004 | Docket Event | Petition Hearing | |
December 18, 2003 | Docket Event | Fee Waiver Denied | |
December 18, 2003 | Docket Event | Additional Fee Waiver Denied | |
December 15, 2003 | Docket Event | Order Granted | |
December 12, 2003 | Docket Event | Petition | |
December 12, 2003 | Docket Event | Relative Guardianship |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.