Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) Civil case against James Lee Jackson, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts Santa Maria - Miller - Traffic with No Assigned Judge presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNo Assigned Judge Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 08, 2005 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedJanuary 24, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Maria - Miller - Traffic |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 27, 2005 | Action | DMV Abstract Record Sent | |
October 05, 2005 | Action | FTA Notice, Mailed | |
September 13, 2005 | Hearing |
Arraignment
Judge: Steven D Belasco |
|
June 28, 2005 | Hearing |
Arraignment
Judge: Steven D Belasco |
|
June 09, 2005 | Action | Clerk's Note | |
June 09, 2005 | Action | Clerk's Note | |
June 09, 2005 | Action | Clerk's Note | |
June 09, 2005 | Action | Courtesy Notice, Mailed | |
June 09, 2005 | Action | Need to Assess - No Civil Assessments | |
June 08, 2005 | Action | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.