Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with PROB. COMM. GORMAN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePROB. COMM. GORMAN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 07, 2022 |
CategoryFa - General Administration |
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
HP5 - FIRST&FIN ACCT/PET/DIST - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: PROB. COMM. GORMAN |
|
June 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
3855 - Request for Special Notice Request for Special Notice - Transaction 9727498 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-16-2023:13:08:47 |
|
June 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9727499 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-16-2023:13:09:36 |
|
June 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
2610 - Notice ... Notice of Amanda Williamson's Assignment of Beneficial Interest - Transaction 9727498 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-16-2023:13:08:47 |
|
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
2610 - Notice ... Notice of Amanda Williamson's Assignment of Beneficial Interest 2 - Transaction 9681935 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 05-23-2023:01:31:27 |
|
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9681936 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 05-23-2023:01:31:56 |
|
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
MIN - ***Minutes 4/26/2023: Petition to Confirm Sale of Real Property located at 5260 Mesa Verde Drive, Sparks, Nevada 89434 - Transaction 9655889 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 05-08-2023:16:13:10 |
|
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9655893 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 05-08-2023:16:13:41 |
|
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9639500 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 04-28-2023:10:42:39 |
|
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
2810 - Ord Confirm/Sale Real ORDER GRANTING PETITION TO CONFIRM SALE OF REAL PROPERTY - Transaction 9639497 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 04-28-2023:10:42:01 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.