Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with GORMAN, PROB. COMM. EDMUND J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGORMAN, PROB. COMM. EDMUND J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 02, 2022 |
CategoryTn - Trust/Conservatorship |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
2540 - Notice of Entry of Ord Transaction 9458535 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-17-2023:11:59:27 |
|
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9458540 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-17-2023:12:00:13 |
|
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
F140 - Adj Summary Judgment Extra Text: |
|
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9456048 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-13-2023:13:24:08 |
|
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
3357 - Ord upon Petition ORDER FOR ASSUMPTION OF JURISDICTION AND CONFIRMATION OF APPOINTMENT OF SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE; AND ORDER TRANSFERRING PROPERTY INTO TRUST [NRS 163.002 and NRS 164.015] - Transaction 9456047 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-13-2023:13:23:40 |
|
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9453409 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-12-2023:12:00:08 |
|
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
MIN - ***Minutes 1/11/2023: Petition for Assumption of Jurisdiction and Confirmation of Appointment of Successor Trustee; Petition for Order Transferring Property into Trust [NRS 163.002 AND NRS 164.015] - Transaction 9453401 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-12-2023:11:59:17 |
|
January 11, 2023 | Hearing |
HP26 - OTHER PROB/TRST/GDSHP HRG D425 - Granted filed on: 01/11/2023 Extra Text: JAVS/ZOOM/COURTROOM B / RBRANUM 1/11/2023: Petition for Assumption of Jurisdiction and Confirmation of Appointment of Successor Trustee; Petition for Order Transferring Property into Trust [NRS 163.002 AND NRS 164.015] The appointment of Mason L. Brawley as Trustee of THE JONATHAN WHEELER RANKIN REVOCABLE LIVING TRUST dated August 31, 2017 is confirmed Judge: PROB. COMM. GORMAN |
|
January 11, 2023 | Hearing |
HP26 - OTHER PROB/TRST/GDSHP HRG - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: PROB. COMM. GORMAN |
|
December 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9399739 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 12-08-2022:12:34:27 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.