Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with PROB. COMM. GORMAN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePROB. COMM. GORMAN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 29, 2022 |
CategoryFa - General Administration |
Last RefreshedOctober 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
HP26 - OTHER PROB/TRST/GDSHP HRG - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: PROB. COMM. GORMAN |
|
July 26, 2023 | Hearing |
HP26 - OTHER PROB/TRST/GDSHP HRG - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: PROB. COMM. GORMAN |
|
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
1820 - Inventory Appraisement&Record Transaction 9746253 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-28-2023:12:48:07 |
|
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9746256 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-28-2023:12:48:45 |
|
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9733027 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-21-2023:11:50:51 |
|
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9733120 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-21-2023:12:15:09 |
|
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
2550 - Notice of Hearing Transaction 9733025 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-21-2023:11:50:07 |
|
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
1040P - Affidavit of Mailing - PR Transaction 9733118 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-21-2023:12:14:42 |
|
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
3455 - Pet Appoint Public Admin. Transaction 9724939 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-15-2023:12:45:47 |
|
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9724943 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-15-2023:12:46:27 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.