Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with GORMAN, PROB. COMM. EDMUND J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGORMAN, PROB. COMM. EDMUND J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 29, 2022 |
CategorySu - Summary Administration |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
2777 - Ord Approving ... ORDER REVOKING SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION OF ESTATE, CONVERTING ESTATE TO GENERAL ADMINISTRATION - Transaction 9826332 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 08-11-2023:13:31:04 |
|
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9826341 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 08-11-2023:13:31:55 |
|
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
MIN - ***Minutes 8/9/2023: Petition to Revoke Summary Administration of Estate and Convert to General Administration - Transaction 9820901 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 08-09-2023:12:28:01 |
|
August 09, 2023 | Hearing |
HP26 - OTHER PROB/TRST/GDSHP HRG D425 - Granted filed on: 08/09/2023 Extra Text: JAVS/ZOOM/COURTROOM B/RBRANUM 8/9/2023: Petition to Revoke Summary Administration of Estate and Convert to General Administration Judge: PROB. COMM. GORMAN |
|
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9820903 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 08-09-2023:12:28:30 |
|
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
1040P - Affidavit of Mailing - PR Transaction 9818573 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 08-08-2023:12:20:55 |
|
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9818577 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 08-08-2023:12:21:47 |
|
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9818075 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 08-08-2023:09:55:34 |
|
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
3715 - Proof of Publication Transaction 9818070 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 08-08-2023:09:54:54 |
|
July 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9761221 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 07-07-2023:12:12:51 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.