Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with GORMAN, PROB. COMM. EDMUND J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGORMAN, PROB. COMM. EDMUND J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 28, 2022 |
CategoryFa - General Administration |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 17, 2023 | Hearing |
S1 - Request for Submission S200 - Request for Submission Complet filed on: 10/19/2023 Extra Text: DECREE 10/19/23 Judge: PROB. COMM. GORMAN |
|
July 12, 2023 | Hearing |
HP12 - PET/FINAL DISTRIBUTION - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: PROB. COMM. GORMAN |
|
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
1040P - Affidavit of Mailing - PR Transaction 9721448 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-13-2023:16:38:31 |
|
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
1755 - First & Final Acct Final Dist Transaction 9720876 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-13-2023:14:45:00 |
|
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9720881 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-13-2023:14:45:41 |
|
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
2550 - Notice of Hearing 7/12/2023 @10:00 Transaction 9721448 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-13-2023:16:38:31 |
|
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9721453 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-13-2023:16:39:10 |
|
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
1040P - Affidavit of Mailing - PR Transaction 9682410 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 05-23-2023:09:28:35 |
|
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9682412 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 05-23-2023:09:28:56 |
|
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9681023 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 05-22-2023:15:30:36 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.