Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with GORMAN, PROB. COMM. EDMUND J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGORMAN, PROB. COMM. EDMUND J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 23, 2022 |
CategoryTn - Trust/Conservatorship |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9464940 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-19-2023:15:10:49 |
|
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
MIN - ***Minutes 1/18/2023: Petition to Confirm Trust Asset - Transaction 9464924 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-19-2023:15:09:32 |
|
January 18, 2023 | Hearing |
HP26 - OTHER PROB/TRST/GDSHP HRG D425 - Granted filed on: 01/18/2023 Extra Text: JAVS/ZOOM/COURTROOM B/ RBRANUM 1/18/2023: Petition to Confirm Trust Asset Judge: PROB. COMM. GORMAN |
|
January 18, 2023 | Hearing |
HP26 - OTHER PROB/TRST/GDSHP HRG - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: PROB. COMM. GORMAN |
|
January 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
4100 - Supplemental Petition Transaction 9451552 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-11-2023:14:53:48 |
|
January 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
2589 - Notice of Stricken Document SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION MISSING DISTRICT COURT CASE NO., FILED 1-11-23 BY THERESE SHANKS ESQ - Transaction 9451530 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-11-2023:14:47:27 |
|
January 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9451563 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-11-2023:14:56:51 |
|
January 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9451543 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-11-2023:14:48:34 |
|
January 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9451423 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-11-2023:14:27:47 |
|
January 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
4100 - Supplemental Petition STRIKING THE SUPPLEMENTAL PETITION FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON: DOCUMENT DOES NOT HAVE A DISTRICT COURT CASE NUMBER – WDCR 10(10)(c)(1) Transaction 9451405 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-11-2023:14:26:16 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.