Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with GORMAN, PROB. COMM. EDMUND J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGORMAN, PROB. COMM. EDMUND J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 22, 2022 |
CategorySe - Set Aside |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
2540 - Notice of Entry of Ord Transaction 9450563 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-11-2023:11:14:14 |
|
January 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9450571 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-11-2023:11:15:22 |
|
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9441465 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-05-2023:14:37:58 |
|
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
3240 - Ord Set Aside Est w/o Admin ORDER GRANTING PETITION TO PROVE WILL AND SET ASIDE ESTATE WITHOUT ADMINISTRATION - Transaction 9441450 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-05-2023:14:35:06 |
|
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
F140 - Adj Summary Judgment Extra Text: |
|
January 04, 2023 | Hearing |
HP22 - PET/SETASIDE/W/O/ADMIN D425 - Granted filed on: 01/04/2023 Extra Text: JAVS/ZOOM/COURTROOM B/RBRANUM 1/4/2023: Petition to Prove Will and Set Aside Estate Without Administration Judge: PROB. COMM. GORMAN |
|
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
MIN - ***Minutes 1/4/2023: Petition to Prove Will and Set Aside Estate Without Administration - Transaction 9438083 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-04-2023:11:25:14 |
|
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9438088 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-04-2023:11:25:55 |
|
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
4295 - Will 1/4/2023: Petition to Prove Will and Set Aside Estate Without Administration - Transaction 9438083 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-04-2023:11:25:14 |
|
January 04, 2023 | Hearing |
HP22 - PET/SETASIDE/W/O/ADMIN - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: PROB. COMM. GORMAN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.