Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with GORMAN, PROB. COMM. EDMUND J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGORMAN, PROB. COMM. EDMUND J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 17, 2022 |
CategorySe - Set Aside |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
3240 - Ord Set Aside Est w/o Admin ORDER SETTING ASIDE ESTATE WITHOUT ADMINISTRATION - Transaction 9424152 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 12-22-2022:16:24:34 |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
MIN - ***Minutes 12/21/2022: Petition to Set Aside Without Administration - Transaction 9423747 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 12-22-2022:14:55:13 |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
F140 - Adj Summary Judgment Extra Text: |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9424160 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 12-22-2022:16:25:25 |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
MIN - ***Minutes 12/14/2022: Petition to Set Aside Estate Without Administration - Transaction 9423740 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 12-22-2022:14:51:24 |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9423742 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 12-22-2022:14:51:55 |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9423750 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 12-22-2022:14:55:59 |
|
December 21, 2022 | Hearing |
HP22 - PET/SETASIDE/W/O/ADMIN D425 - Granted filed on: 12/21/2022 Extra Text: JAVS/ZOOM/COURTROOM B/RBRANUM 12/21/2022: Petition to Set Aside Without Administration Judge: PROB. COMM. GORMAN |
|
December 21, 2022 | Hearing |
HP22 - PET/SETASIDE/W/O/ADMIN - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: PROB. COMM. GORMAN |
|
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9411306 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 12-15-2022:10:17:56 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.