Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with GORMAN, PROB. COMM. EDMUND J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGORMAN, PROB. COMM. EDMUND J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 09, 2022 |
CategorySu - Summary Administration |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 23, 2023 | Hearing |
S1 - Request for Submission S200 - Request for Submission Complet filed on: 10/26/2023 Extra Text: DECREE 10/26/23 Judge: PROB. COMM. GORMAN |
|
July 05, 2023 | Hearing |
HP12 - PET/FINAL DISTRIBUTION - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: PROB. COMM. GORMAN |
|
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9713513 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-08-2023:17:37:32 |
|
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
2550 - Notice of Hearing Transaction 9713512 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-08-2023:17:37:06 |
|
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9672050 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 05-17-2023:13:03:45 |
|
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
3530 - Pet Final Distribution Transaction 9672045 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 05-17-2023:13:02:54 |
|
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9524864 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 02-23-2023:12:58:28 |
|
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
3715 - Proof of Publication Transaction 9524861 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 02-23-2023:12:57:53 |
|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9474030 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-25-2023:11:16:13 |
|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
1639 - **Document Issued by the Court Transaction 9474014 - Approved By: ADIXON : 01-25-2023:11:15:35 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.