Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Tamatha R. Schreinert presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTamatha R. Schreinert Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2022 |
CategoryGb - Guardianship Of A Minor |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 23, 2023 | Hearing |
HP7 - PET/APPT/GDN/MINOR - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: TAMATHA SCHREINERT |
|
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9468494 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-23-2023:10:07:59 |
|
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
2915 - Ord Dismissal w/o Prejudice Transaction 9468489 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-23-2023:10:07:19 |
|
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
F235 - Voluntary Dismissal Extra Text: |
|
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
MIN - ***Minutes 01-13-23 GUARDIANSHIP - Transaction 9457037 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-13-2023:19:39:34 |
|
January 13, 2023 | Hearing |
HP4 - EXTEND/TEMP GDSHP - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: TAMATHA SCHREINERT |
|
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9457038 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-13-2023:19:40:03 |
|
December 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
GRRI - Guardianship Required Information Sheet GRRI: amended - Transaction 9430912 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 12-29-2022:08:20:54 |
|
December 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9430917 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 12-29-2022:08:21:19 |
|
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9426430 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 12-27-2022:09:00:42 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.