Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with SHANNON, MASTER GREG presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSHANNON, MASTER GREG Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 21, 2022 |
CategoryUf - Intrastate (Title Iv-D) |
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2022 | Hearing |
H353 - FINANCIAL RESPONSIBILITY - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: MASTER SHANNON |
|
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9395845 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 12-07-2022:07:54:41 |
|
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
3870 - Request Exhibits for the court hearing - Transaction 9395843 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 12-07-2022:07:54:10 |
|
November 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
2550 - Notice of Hearing 12/12/2022 10:30AM Transaction 9377275 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 11-23-2022:11:56:06 |
|
November 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
1457 - Confidential Document(s) NOTICE OF PARTIES ADDRESSES (TO REMAIN CONFIDENTIAL) - Transaction 9377275 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 11-23-2022:11:56:06 |
|
November 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9377276 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 11-23-2022:11:56:36 |
|
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
3720 - Proof of Service Transaction 9372115 - Approved By: CSULEZIC : 11-21-2022:10:15:35 |
|
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
3845 - Request for Hearing Transaction 9372115 - Approved By: CSULEZIC : 11-21-2022:10:15:35 |
|
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
2504 - Notice/Find/Finan/Prntl/Respon Transaction 9372115 - Approved By: CSULEZIC : 11-21-2022:10:15:35 |
|
November 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
COV - **Civil Cover Sheet Transaction 9372115 - Approved By: CSULEZIC : 11-21-2022:10:15:35 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.