Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Aimee E. Banales presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAimee E. Banales Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 06, 2022 |
CategoryLs - Separate Maintenance |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 21, 2023 | Hearing |
H185 - CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE D844 - Vacated-Reset filed on: 12/12/2022 Extra Text: Judge: AIMEE BANALES |
|
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
F255 - Setld/Withdrn with Jud Conf/Hg Extra Text: |
|
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9447185 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-09-2023:16:15:38 |
|
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
1545 - Decree of ... Legal Separation - Transaction 9447177 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-09-2023:16:14:42 |
|
December 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9431789 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 12-29-2022:12:57:39 |
|
December 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
MCONF - **Confidential Minutes 12/29/22 CMC - Transaction 9431787 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 12-29-2022:12:57:07 |
|
December 29, 2022 | Hearing |
H185 - CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE D640 - Ord Entered filed on: 12/29/2022 Extra Text: DECREE OF LEGAL SEPERATION CLERK M. FIALA CD RECORD Judge: DEBORAH SCHUMACHER |
|
December 29, 2022 | Hearing |
H185 - CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: DEBORAH SCHUMACHER |
|
December 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
3720 - Proof of Service JAMES CANNON 12/10/2022Transaction 9428628 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 12-28-2022:08:54:27 |
|
December 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9428630 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 12-28-2022:08:55:16 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.