Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
filed a(n) Mt - Mental Competency - Civil case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Tammy M. Riggs presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTammy M. Riggs Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 23, 2022 |
CategoryMt - Mental Competency - Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9569281 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-20-2023:18:03:42 |
|
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
MIN - ***Minutes 1/9/23 PSYCH EVAL - Transaction 9569280 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-20-2023:18:03:14 |
|
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
2968 - Ord of Competency/Return JC Transaction 9447752 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-10-2023:08:40:20 ORDER EFILED INTO RJC CASE RCR2022-120211 ON 1/10/23. nm |
|
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9447754 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-10-2023:08:40:54 |
|
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
F230 - Other Manner of Disposition Extra Text: |
|
January 09, 2023 | Hearing |
H780 - REPORT PSYCHIATRIC EVALUATION D412 - Found Competent Returned to JC filed on: 01/09/2023 Extra Text: Judge: TAMMY RIGGS |
|
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
1652 - Evaluations CONFIDENTIAL COMPETENCY EVALUATION TO BE FILED UNDER SEAL Transaction 9421298 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 12-21-2022:14:02:30 |
|
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9421302 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 12-21-2022:14:03:06 |
|
December 19, 2022 | Hearing |
H780 - REPORT PSYCHIATRIC EVALUATION D844 - Vacated-Reset filed on: 12/16/2022 Extra Text: VACATED AND CONTINUED TO ALLOW SECOND EVALUATION TO BE COMPLETED Judge: TAMMY RIGGS |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9413375 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 12-16-2022:09:07:20 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.