Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Vc - Veterans Court case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Eagan K. Walker presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEagan K. Walker Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 16, 2021 |
CategoryVc - Veterans Court |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
2920 - Ord for Dismissal... ORDER OF SUCCESSFUL COMPLETION AND DISMISSAL - Transaction 9233316 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 08-30-2022:10:48:53 |
|
August 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9233319 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 08-30-2022:10:49:33 |
|
August 25, 2022 | Hearing |
H282 - Graduation - Veterans Court D297 - SC-Graduated-Veterans Court filed on: 08/25/2022 Extra Text: DEFENDANT GRADUATED VETERANS COURT COURT GRANTED: PROBATION WAS SATISFIED AND DEFT'S CASE TO BE CONDITIONALLY DISMISSED Judge: EGAN WALKER |
|
August 18, 2022 | Hearing |
H282 - Graduation - Veterans Court D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 08/18/2022 Extra Text: COMPLIANT WITH COURT PROGRAM Judge: EGAN WALKER |
|
July 21, 2022 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 07/21/2022 Extra Text: COMPLIANT WITH COURT PROGRAM; SET FOR GRADUATION Judge: EGAN WALKER |
|
June 30, 2022 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 06/30/2022 Extra Text: COMPLIANT WITH COURT PROGRAM; TRAVEL PASS GRANTED FROM 07/21 - 07/24 - TEST PRIOR TO AND UPON RETURN - REPORT TO SCC HORNBECK Judge: JERRY POLAHA |
|
June 02, 2022 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 06/02/2022 Extra Text: COMPLIANT WITH COURT PROGRAM Judge: EGAN WALKER |
|
May 12, 2022 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 05/12/2022 Extra Text: COMPLIANT WITH COURT PROGRAM Judge: JERRY POLAHA |
|
May 12, 2022 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: JERRY POLAHA |
|
April 21, 2022 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 04/21/2022 Extra Text: COMPLIANT WITH COURT PROGRAM Judge: EGAN WALKER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.