Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Xd - Diversion Court case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Scott N. Freeman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeScott N. Freeman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 24, 2021 |
CategoryXd - Diversion Court |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
2920 - Ord for Dismissal... Transaction 9744559 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-27-2023:15:32:26 |
|
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9744565 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-27-2023:15:33:11 |
|
June 26, 2023 | Hearing |
H280 - SC-Graduation D381 - Dismissed - 176A (Set Aside) filed on: 06/26/2023 Extra Text: GRADUATED THE MAT COURT PROGRAM; 176A DEFERRED STATUS SET ASIDE AND DISMISSED. Judge: SCOTT FREEMAN |
|
June 12, 2023 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 06/12/2023 Extra Text: COMPLIANT WITH COURT PROGRAM Judge: SCOTT FREEMAN |
|
June 05, 2023 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 06/05/2023 Extra Text: COURT ORDERED: DEFT TO BE TESTED TODAY AT THE WCJ. SHE IS TO BE RELEASED ON ALL MATTERS RELATING TO THIS CASE TODAY AFTER HER TEST HAS BEEN ADMINISTERED; DEFT'S PROGRAM IS EXTENDED FOR AN ADDITIONAL 30 DAYS. Judge: SCOTT FREEMAN |
|
May 22, 2023 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 05/22/2023 Extra Text: COMPLIANT WITH COURT PROGRAM. PER JUDGE'S ORDER ON 5/23/23: DEFT WAS ARRESTED ON 5/22/23; DEFENDANT IS PLACED ON A NO BAIL COURT HOLD. Judge: SCOTT FREEMAN |
|
May 15, 2023 | Hearing |
H280 - SC-Graduation D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 05/15/2023 Extra Text: NOT COMPLIANT WITH THERAPUTIC REQUIREMENTS; GRADUATION IS EXTENDED BY 30 DAYS. Judge: LYNNE SIMONS |
|
April 17, 2023 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 04/17/2023 Extra Text: COMPLIANT WITH COURT PROGRAM. Judge: LYNNE SIMONS |
|
April 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
PAYRC - **Payment Receipted A Payment of -$750.00 was made on receipt DCDC715337. |
|
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
PAYRC - **Payment Receipted A Payment of -$700.00 was made on receipt DCDC714293. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.