Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with William A. Maddox presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam A. Maddox Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 23, 2021 |
CategoryXi - Felony Dui Court |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 29, 2023 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: JERRY POLAHA |
|
August 23, 2023 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: JERRY POLAHA |
|
August 09, 2023 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 08/09/2023 Extra Text: MISSED TEST - JUDICIAL ADMONISHMENT Judge: JERRY POLAHA |
|
June 21, 2023 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 06/21/2023 Extra Text: COMPLIANT WITH COURT PROGRAM Judge: JERRY POLAHA |
|
May 24, 2023 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 05/24/2023 Extra Text: COMPLIANT WITH COURT PROGRAM Judge: JERRY POLAHA |
|
April 26, 2023 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 04/26/2023 Extra Text: COMPLIANT WITH COURT PROGRAM Judge: JERRY POLAHA |
|
March 29, 2023 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 03/29/2023 Extra Text: 03/28 DILUTE - JUDICAL ADMONISHMENT Judge: JERRY POLAHA |
|
February 08, 2023 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 02/08/2023 Extra Text: COMPLIANT WITH COURT PROGRAM. Judge: JERRY POLAHA |
|
January 11, 2023 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 01/11/2023 Extra Text: COMPLIANT WITH COURT PROGRAM Judge: JERRY POLAHA |
|
December 07, 2022 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 12/07/2022 Extra Text: COMPLIANT WITH COURT PROGRAM Judge: JERRY POLAHA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.