Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Xd - Diversion Court case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Scott N. Freeman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeScott N. Freeman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 26, 2021 |
CategoryXd - Diversion Court |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9249156 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 09-08-2022:11:31:44 |
|
September 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9249148 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 09-08-2022:11:29:43 |
|
September 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
3405 - Pet/Ord Dism Set Aside Convict PETITION FOR DISMISSAL AND DISCHARGE AND SETTING ASIDE OF CONVICTION - Transaction 9249043 - Approved By: CSULEZIC : 09-08-2022:11:29:12 |
|
September 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
3405 - Pet/Ord Dism Set Aside Convict Transaction 9249150 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 09-08-2022:11:30:59 |
|
August 29, 2022 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D381 - Dismissed - 176A (Set Aside) filed on: 08/29/2022 Extra Text: GRADUATED THE MAT COURT PROGRAM; DEFENDANT'S DEFERRED STATUS IS SET ASIDE AND DISMISSED. Judge: TAMMY RIGGS |
|
August 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
3345 - Ord Reinstate Probation 8/15/2022: Specialty Court Review Hearing - Transaction 9231972 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 08-29-2022:15:33:10 |
|
August 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9231979 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 08-29-2022:15:33:51 |
|
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
FIE - **Document Filed in Error FILED IN ERROR - LSCURLOCK - 8/29/2022 |
|
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9208043 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 08-16-2022:12:08:47 |
|
August 15, 2022 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 08/15/2022 Extra Text: NOT COMPLIANT DUE TO POSITIVE TEST; DEFENDANT'S GRADUATION TO BE EXTENDED 90 DAYS COURT ORDERED: TERM OF PROBATION EXTENDED 90 DAYS. Judge: SCOTT FREEMAN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.