Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Tammy M. Riggs presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTammy M. Riggs Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 28, 2021 |
CategoryXa - Adult Drug Court |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8492646 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-11-2021:17:09:23 |
|
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
3946 - Specialty Court Ord Returning Case to Dept (Diversion) Transaction 8492643 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-11-2021:17:08:33 |
|
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
3835 - Report... Transaction 8490402 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-10-2021:16:37:59 |
|
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8490409 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-10-2021:16:38:57 |
|
June 09, 2021 | Hearing |
H820 - STATUS HEARING D330 - SC-Removed from Specialty Crt filed on: 06/09/2021 Extra Text: DEFENDANT IS REMOVED FROM THE SPECIALTY COURT PROGRAM DUE TO HIS IMMIGRATION STATUS; COURT ORDERED: DEFENDANT IS RETURNED TO DEPARTMENT 10 FOR ALL FURTHER MATTERS. DEFENDANT SHALL REMAIN IN CUSTODY AND APPEAR ON 7/2/21 AT 9:00 A.M. IN D10. Judge: TAMMY RIGGS |
|
June 09, 2021 | Hearing |
H820 - STATUS HEARING - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: TAMMY RIGGS |
|
June 02, 2021 | Hearing |
H276 - SC-FIRST APPEARANCE D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 06/02/2021 Extra Text: COURT ORDERED: DEFENDANT TO BE RELEASED ON ALL MATTERS RELATING TO THIS CASE TO IAP TO TRANSPORT TO FIRST AVAILABLE RESIDENTIAL PROGRAM. Judge: TAMMY RIGGS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.