Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Kathleen M. Drakulich presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKathleen M. Drakulich Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 03, 2021 |
CategoryXi - Felony Dui Court |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 16, 2021 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D845 - Vacated filed on: 06/15/2021 Extra Text: SCC REVIEW HRG 06/16/2021 VACATED PER SCC. DEFT TRANSFERRED TO CARSON CITY DUI COURT AND HAS MADE HIS FIRST APPEARANCE THERE. Judge: KATHLEEN DRAKULICH |
|
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
6170 - Ord Trans Jurisdiction ORDER TRANSFERING SUPERVISION - Transaction 8488374 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-10-2021:07:22:33 |
|
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8488376 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-10-2021:07:23:24 |
|
June 09, 2021 | Hearing |
H276 - SC-FIRST APPEARANCE D902 - SC-Transferred to Spec Court filed on: 06/09/2021 Extra Text: COMPLIANT WITH COURT PROGRAM BASED UPON DEFT RESIDING AND WORKING IN CARSON CITY, COURT ORDERED DEFT'S DUI SPECIALTY COURTS SUPERVISION TRANSFERRED TO 1JD SPECIALTY COURTS COURT FURTHER ORDERED THAT DEFT MAINTAIN COMPLIANCE WITH 2JD SPECIALTY COURTS UNTIL THE TRANSFER FORMALLY OCCURS Judge: KATHLEEN DRAKULICH |
|
June 09, 2021 | Hearing |
H276 - SC-FIRST APPEARANCE - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: KATHLEEN DRAKULICH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.