Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
filed a(n) Xv - Veterans Court case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Eagan K. Walker presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEagan K. Walker Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 02, 2021 |
CategoryXv - Veterans Court |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
2991 - Ord Returning ORDER RETURNING CASE FROM SPECIALTY COURT TO ORIGINAL DEPARTMENT - Transaction 8548952 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 07-19-2021:08:05:44 |
|
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8548953 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 07-19-2021:08:06:35 |
|
July 15, 2021 | Hearing |
H644 - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE D330 - SC-Removed from Specialty Crt filed on: 07/15/2021 Extra Text: DEFENDANT IS REMOVED FROM THE VETERAN COURT PROGRAM; DEFENDANT IS RETURNED TO DEPARTMENT NO. 9.; DEFENDANT IS TO REMAIN IN CUSTODY UNTIL SEEN BY DEPARTMENT 9 ON 08/09/2021 AT 9:00 A.M. Judge: EGAN WALKER |
|
July 15, 2021 | Hearing |
H644 - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: EGAN WALKER |
|
July 08, 2021 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 07/08/2021 Extra Text: DEFENDANT IS ORDERED TO REMAIN IN CUSTODY ON A NO BAIL COURT HOLD UNTIL SEEN ON JULY 15, 2021 AT 16:00 P.M. FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Judge: EGAN WALKER |
|
July 08, 2021 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: EGAN WALKER |
|
July 01, 2021 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 07/01/2021 Extra Text: COURT ORDER; DEFT TO GO TO SHELTER ON 07/01/2021; DEFT TO BE IN A T/L PROGRAM BY 07/02/2021; DAILY TESTING Judge: EGAN WALKER |
|
July 01, 2021 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: EGAN WALKER |
|
June 24, 2021 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 06/24/2021 Extra Text: N/P; CONTINUED ONE WEEK PER SCC Judge: CONNIE STEINHEIMER |
|
June 24, 2021 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: CONNIE STEINHEIMER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.