Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Tammy M. Riggs presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTammy M. Riggs Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 02, 2021 |
CategoryXa - Adult Drug Court |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9245178 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 09-06-2022:19:32:19 |
|
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
3359 - Ord Waiving Fees and Costs Transaction 9245177 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 09-06-2022:19:31:49 |
|
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
3370 - Order ... ORDER OF SUCCESSFUL COMPLETION - Transaction 9143280 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 07-12-2022:10:58:01 |
|
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9143284 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 07-12-2022:10:58:38 |
|
July 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
3947 - Specialty Court Ord Returning Case to Dept (Probation) Transaction 9138175 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 07-08-2022:08:21:26 |
|
July 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9138180 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 07-08-2022:08:22:07 |
|
July 07, 2022 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D294 - SC-Graduated/Pend Final Diso filed on: 07/07/2022 Extra Text: GRADUATED THE ADULT DRUG COURT PROGRAM; DEFENDANT'S CASE IS RETURNED TO DEPARTMENT 6 FOR FINAL DISPOSITION OF THIS CASE AND DISCHARGE OF PROBATION. Judge: TAMMY RIGGS |
|
July 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
PAYRC - **Payment Receipted A Payment of -$50.00 was made on receipt DCDC693994. |
|
June 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
PAYRC - **Payment Receipted A Payment of -$450.00 was made on receipt DCDC693406. |
|
June 09, 2022 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 06/09/2022 Extra Text: COMPLIANT WITH COURT PROGRAM Judge: TAMMY RIGGS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.