Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Scott N. Freeman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeScott N. Freeman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 27, 2021 |
CategoryXa - Adult Drug Court |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9122332 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-28-2022:14:39:03 |
|
June 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
4075 - Substitution of Counsel WENDY CHAVEZ APD IN PLACE OF IRENE HART APD FOR ASHLEY WILLIAMS Transaction 9122330 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-28-2022:14:38:19 |
|
June 27, 2022 | Hearing |
H280 - SC-Graduation D284 - SC-Graduated/Prob C. Satisfied filed on: 06/27/2022 Extra Text: DEFENDANT SUCCESSFULLLY COMPLETED THE DRUG COURT PROGRAM. COURT GRANTED EARLY HONORABLE DISCHARGE FROM PROBATION. Judge: LYNNE JONES |
|
June 13, 2022 | Hearing |
H280 - SC-Graduation D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 06/13/2022 Extra Text: DEFENDANT VIOLATED HER PROBATION AGREEMENT; COURT ORDERED: GRADUATION IS POSTPONED. Judge: SCOTT FREEMAN |
|
June 06, 2022 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 06/06/2022 Extra Text: COMPLIANT WITH COURT PROGRAM. Judge: SCOTT FREEMAN |
|
May 16, 2022 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 05/16/2022 Extra Text: COMPLIANT WITH COURT PROGRAM. Judge: SCOTT FREEMAN |
|
May 16, 2022 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: SCOTT FREEMAN |
|
April 25, 2022 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 04/25/2022 Extra Text: COMPLIANT WITH COURT PROGRAM Judge: SCOTT FREEMAN |
|
April 25, 2022 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: SCOTT FREEMAN |
|
April 11, 2022 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 04/11/2022 Extra Text: COMPLIANT WITH COURT PROGRAM. Judge: SCOTT FREEMAN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.