Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Xd - Diversion Court case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with Tammy M. Riggs presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTammy M. Riggs Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 01, 2021 |
CategoryXd - Diversion Court |
Last RefreshedApril 27, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2022 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: TAMMY RIGGS |
|
April 13, 2022 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: TAMMY RIGGS |
|
April 06, 2022 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 04/06/2022 Extra Text: DEFENDANT CROSS TESTED ON APRIL 4TH DUE TO TAKING A PROHIBITTED OTC MEDICATION. COURT ORDERED: DEFT TO COMPLETE AN ESSAY RE: MEDICATION POLICY AND CEASE TAKING THE OTC MED. Judge: TAMMY RIGGS |
|
March 30, 2022 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 03/30/2022 Extra Text: COMPLIANT WITH COURT PROGRAM. Judge: TAMMY RIGGS |
|
March 09, 2022 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 03/09/2022 Extra Text: COMPLIANT WITH COURT PROGRAM Judge: TAMMY RIGGS |
|
March 09, 2022 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: TAMMY RIGGS |
|
March 02, 2022 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 03/02/2022 Extra Text: NOT COMPLIANT - POSITIVE THC (02/25/2022) COURT ORDERED: DEFT TO ATTEND DAILY SELF HELP MEETINGS FOR THE NEXT 7 DAYS; DEFT TO CONTACT SCC BROWN Judge: TAMMY RIGGS |
|
February 16, 2022 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 02/16/2022 Extra Text: COMPLIANT WITH COURT PROGRAM. Judge: TAMMY RIGGS |
|
February 16, 2022 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: TAMMY RIGGS |
|
January 26, 2022 | Hearing |
H284 - SC-REVIEW HEARING D293 - SC-Heard - Continued filed on: 01/26/2022 Extra Text: COMPLIANT WITH COURT PROGRAM. Judge: TAMMY RIGGS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.