Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with GORMAN, PROB. COMM. EDMUND J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGORMAN, PROB. COMM. EDMUND J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 17, 2021 |
CategoryFa - General Administration |
Last RefreshedApril 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 05, 2023 | Hearing |
HP12 - PET/FINAL DISTRIBUTION - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: PROB. COMM. GORMAN |
|
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
3530 - Pet Final Distribution Transaction 9542317 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-06-2023:13:54:09 |
|
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
2550 - Notice of Hearing Transaction 9543516 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-06-2023:16:55:08 |
|
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9542323 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-06-2023:13:54:50 |
|
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9543518 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-06-2023:16:55:47 |
|
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9443970 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-06-2023:14:47:07 |
|
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
3830 - Report to Court - NRS 143.035 Transaction 9443962 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-06-2023:14:46:15 |
|
November 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
2610 - Notice ... Notice of Non-Compliance - Transaction 9355478 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 11-09-2022:14:08:49 |
|
November 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9355483 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 11-09-2022:14:09:33 |
|
March 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
4285 - Waiver ... WAIVER OF FILING INVENTORY AND APPRAISAL Transaction 8969538 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-29-2022:09:39:49 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.