Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with GORMAN, PROB. COMM. EDMUND J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGORMAN, PROB. COMM. EDMUND J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 16, 2021 |
CategorySe - Set Aside |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
2540 - Notice of Entry of Ord Transaction 8654648 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 09-20-2021:11:48:48 |
|
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8654654 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 09-20-2021:11:49:46 |
|
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
3240 - Ord Set Aside Est w/o Admin ORDER SETTING ASIDE ESTATE WITHOUT ADMINISTRATION - Transaction 8652884 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 09-17-2021:14:06:50 |
|
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
F140 - Adj Summary Judgment Extra Text: |
|
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8652887 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 09-17-2021:14:07:39 |
|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
MIN - ***Minutes 9/15/2021: Petition to Set Aside Estate under $100,000.00 without further Administration. - Transaction 8647112 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 09-15-2021:10:34:13 |
|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
4295 - Will 9/15/2021: Petition to Set Aside Estate under $100,000.00 without further Administration. - Transaction 8647129 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 09-15-2021:10:35:28 |
|
September 15, 2021 | Hearing |
HP22 - PET/SETASIDE/W/O/ADMIN D425 - Granted filed on: 09/15/2021 Extra Text: JAVS/ZOOM/LSCURLOCK 9/15/2021: Petition to Set Aside Estate under $100,000.00 without further Administration. Judge: PROB. COMM. GORMAN |
|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8647126 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 09-15-2021:10:35:15 |
|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8647133 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 09-15-2021:10:36:22 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.