Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with GORMAN, PROB. COMM. EDMUND J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGORMAN, PROB. COMM. EDMUND J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 13, 2021 |
CategorySu - Summary Administration |
Last RefreshedJuly 13, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 13, 2022 | Hearing |
HP5 - FIRST&FIN ACCT/PET/DIST - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: PROB. COMM. GORMAN |
|
June 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
4100 - Supplemental Petition for Approval of First and Final Account, Approval of Attorneys' Fees and Costs, and for Final Distribution of Estate - Transaction 9121867 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-28-2022:12:49:25 |
|
June 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9121876 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-28-2022:12:50:09 |
|
June 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9116480 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-24-2022:10:34:16 |
|
June 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9117122 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-24-2022:14:07:05 |
|
June 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
2550 - Notice of Hearing Transaction 9117119 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-24-2022:14:06:24 |
|
June 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
3530 - Pet Final Distribution Petition for Approval of First and Final Account, Approval of Attorneys' Fees and Costs, and for Final Distribution of Estate - Transaction 9116474 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-24-2022:10:33:40 |
|
April 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
2540 - Notice of Entry of Ord Transaction 9011870 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 04-22-2022:09:23:00 |
|
April 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9011872 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 04-22-2022:09:23:39 |
|
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 9009633 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 04-21-2022:10:14:55 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.