Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Washoe County, NV, . Washoe County, NV Superior Courts with GORMAN, PROB. COMM. EDMUND J. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGORMAN, PROB. COMM. EDMUND J. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 24, 2021 |
CategorySe - Set Aside |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationWashoe County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
3240 - Ord Set Aside Est w/o Admin ORDER SETTING ASIDE ESTATE WITHOUT ADMINISTRATION ORDER GRANTING ATTOORNEY FEES AND COSTS - Transaction 8491248 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-11-2021:10:31:53 |
|
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8491250 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-11-2021:10:34:04 |
|
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
F140 - Adj Summary Judgment Extra Text: |
|
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8487905 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-09-2021:15:35:44 |
|
June 09, 2021 | Hearing |
HP22 - PET/SETASIDE/W/O/ADMIN D425 - Granted filed on: 06/09/2021 Extra Text: JAVS/ZOOM/L.SCURLOCK 6/9/2021: Petition to Set Aside Estate without Administration. Judge: PROB. COMM. GORMAN |
|
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
MIN - ***Minutes 6/9/2021: Petition to Set Aside Estate without Administration. - Transaction 8487903 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-09-2021:15:34:54 |
|
June 09, 2021 | Hearing |
HP22 - PET/SETASIDE/W/O/ADMIN - filed on: Extra Text: Judge: PROB. COMM. GORMAN |
|
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
NEF - Proof of Electronic Service Transaction 8462642 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 05-25-2021:12:39:16 |
|
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
2550 - Notice of Hearing 06/09/2021 @ 1:00 PM - Transaction 8462639 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 05-25-2021:12:38:15 |
|
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
PAYRC - **Payment Receipted A Payment of $269.50 was made on receipt DCDC674535. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.